Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Emergency Response Team Corp, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Arias, Isabel M, against Gulfstream Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Emergency Response Team Corp. on behalf of Jennifer Pittman against Gulfstream Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff alleges breach of contract and demands a jury trial. The plaintiff is seeking damages exc...
EP - SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: August 26, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 09/12/2019 GULFSTREAM PROPERTYY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS BY ATTY. ROBERT PARSONS FOR PLAINTIFF | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - SUMMONS ISSUED | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 08/26/2019 CASE NUMBER 19003226CA | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: ARIAS, ISABEL M ASSIGNED | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE FISHEL, JOHN L II: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.