Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Spangler, Patricia, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Ward-Singleton, Ashley Nicole, against Gulfstream Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Parker, Julius F Iii, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Patricia Spangler against Gulfstream Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff alleges that she and her deceased spouse had an insurance contract with the defendant for their property located in Panama City, Flor...
EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONF- 7/8/20 AT 10 AM
Date: April 23, 2020PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019046562
Date: August 22, 2019EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE CASE ON TRIAL DOCKET
Date: December 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER REMOVING CAUSE FROM TRIAL DOCKET | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/27/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II : ORDER | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 08/31/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING ORDER OF LIQUIDATION, INJUNCTION, AND AUTOMATIC STAY AS TO GULFSTREAM PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 08/18/21 @ 9:00AM ET | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS FINAL WITNESS LIST AND EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT WITNESS REPORTS IN ACCORDANCE TO TRIAL ORDER | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL WITNESS DISCLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.