Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thayer, Bryan, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Levy, Harold Esq, against Progressive Property Insurance Company, represented by Campos, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
EP - NOTICE OF ENTRY UPON LAND 01/09/2020 @ 11:00 A.M.
Date: December 05, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE
Date: August 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF ENTRY UPON LAND 01/09/2020 @ 11:00 A.M. | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FOR PROGRESSIVE | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DTFS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADD AND INDISPENSABLE THIRD PARTY PLT | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: CAMPOS, JOSE ASSIGNED | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.