Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Strickland, Cindy, Strickland, Gary A, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rosso, Scott M, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Sellar, Kevin Michael, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Gary and Cindy Strickland against Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorneys' fees, and costs. The Plaintiffs and...
EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: August 19, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019045888
Date: August 19, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF HOWARD WANDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDVIT OF HOWARD WANDER ESQ | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: SELLAR, KEVIN MICHAEL ASSIGNED | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS BY ATTY KEVIN SELLAR FOR DEFENDANT | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.