Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Douglas, Marie M, Douglas, Ralph Allen, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Moskowitz, Laurence, against Castle Key Insurance Company, represented by Segura, Monica C, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint was filed by Ralph A. Douglas and Marie M. Douglas against Castle Key Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of cou...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION- 11/30/20 AT 10 AM | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - MEDIATION REPORT - AGREEMENT | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS CASTLE KEY INSURANCE CO NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLTS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DFTS INTERROGATORIES | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - PRIVILEGE LOG - PTF | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - COUNSEL FOR PLTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.