Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Raffield, Clarence, Raffield, Hannah Dobernig, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Morgan, Thomas J Jr, against Asi Preferred Insurance Corporation, represented by Palmer, E Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint was filed by Clarence Raffield and Hannah Raffield against ASI Preferred Insurance Corporation in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The plaintiffs are seeking an amount in excess of $15,000, e...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE
Date: August 15, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 15, 2019EP - COVER LETTER
Date: August 15, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 15, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 15, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 15, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019045137
Date: August 15, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FOR ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.