Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reroof America Contractors Fl Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Jacobson, Lee M, against Peoples Trust Insurance Company, represented by Richardson, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by REROOF AMERICA CONTRACTORS FL, LLC on behalf of Holly Hance against PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. The complaint alleges breach of contract and seeks a declaratory judgment. The jurisdiction of the case is in the Circuit...
EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 13, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 13, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY AND MOTIIN TO STRIKE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FOR REROOF AMERICAN CONTRACTORS FL LLC | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II FOR PEOPLE TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 08/21/2019 PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY, BRETT FRANKEL, ESQ. | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.