Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wend, Ronald, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Arias, Isabel M, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Scharf, Steven Louis, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 12, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 12, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE
Date: August 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 12/19/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN JC/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 12/19/2019 @ 1;30 P.M. | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - ATTY. NATISHA QUIJANO | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: SCHARF, STEVEN LOUIS ASSIGNED | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.