Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Watson, Joshua, Watson, Letitia, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Ross, Vanessa, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Huxtable, Jake David Mr, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Letitia Watson and Joshua Watson against American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida (AMERICAN INTEGRITY). The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. They own a property located at 2908 Ormond Avenue, Pana...
EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 12, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 12, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER GRANTING DFTS MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO RESPOND | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- JAKE HUXTABLE ESQ FOR DFT | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 08/14/2019 AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, MICHAEL SPEROUNES | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.