Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ortiz, Summer Ann, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Bonds, Kele, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCassidy, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Emergency Orders- Granted | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Custody and Support | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.