Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anabel Villasenor, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Rosalio Alexis Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Alan K. Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan K. Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
July 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Emergency Orders- Denied | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Custody and Support | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.