Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Co Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR: FL16-1738
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR fl16-1738
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR FL16-1738
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR FL16-1738 REQ FOR ORDER FILED BY PET
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES: FS11-1078, CRM15-118, CRF11-2077 | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.