Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Co Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions625 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time629 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: October 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
577 OSC/MOT MOD CHLD SPT *Request for Order: Modification Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY ISAIAH GARNER FSD#2-125486 |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION MOD CH SUPP AND ADD ONS FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#2-125486 |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
October 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR GUIDELINE SUPPORT |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: STIP AND ORDER | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DEF ISAIAH GARNER OTHER PARENT TATIANA CARNEY DCSS WARD MATTER DROPPED FROM CALENDAR STIPULATION REACHED AND IS FORTHCOMING Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR MOD, CH SPT, STEP DOWN LANG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.