Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jimenez, Brigida, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Servin, Salvador, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management129 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1370 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1376 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RESP SALVADOR SERVIN ALONG W/ CLK'S CERT OF MLG |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AGAINST RESP SALVADOR SERVIN | |
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET | |
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: RE SERVICE OF DEC OF DISCL AND INC & EXP DEC (PETN'S PRELIM) |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration PROP DECL (QUASI) Notes: DECLARATION OF COMMUNITY & QUASI-COMMUNITY PROPRTY FILED BY PETN |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SARAH'S HOLD BOX UNTIL FILE RETURNED FROM FLF |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES FS 00-662 | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.