Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pretzlaff, Robert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mourguet, Janine, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Time To Trial986 days |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1079 days |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: October 14, 2020*Request for Order: Initial
Date: December 17, 2020*Request for Order: Initial
Date: September 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Settlement Conference Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement Petitioner's Settlement Conference Statement BY PETITIONER |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration BY PETITIONER |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESP. |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement Respondent's Statement of Issues and Proposed Disposition of the Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.