Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Co Of Yolo, County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions73 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: YOLO COUNTY DCSS ** STIP AND ORDER SIGNED 09/26/16 FSD#1130042303-01 | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#1130042303-01 |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR SF16-019 Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES SF16-019 SF07-616 SF06-1129 F308-1817 FS12-1658 CRF 14-1204 | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER FROM DCSS REQUESTING HEARING ON 4/27/15 BE DROPPED AS DEFT COULD NOT BE LOCATED FOR SERVICE | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: DEBTOR ANDREW VAN DYKE FILED BYYOLOC OUNTY DCSS |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO SEEK WORK FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.