Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gavigan, Everett A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gavigan, Angelica, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Time To Trial3772 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time614 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: September 15, 2015*Request for Order: Modification
Date: July 14, 2015*Ex Parte
Date: December 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Evidentiary EVIDENTIARY HEARING Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL *Trial: Court COURT TRIAL Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW *Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Report CCRC REPORT Notes: CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: 5/23/17 |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Modification CHILD SUPPORT AND STEP DOWN LANGUAGE ADD ON'S Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* Notes: TO GOVERNMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; FILED BY RESP |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY RESP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.