Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Simpson, Jeanette Deann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Simpson Ii, Robert Lloyd, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time806 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NTC REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SUB OF PAYEE AS TO SOLANO COUNTY | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) NTC OF PYMT OF SPPT Notes: YOLO CO DCSS IS NO LONGER PROVIDING SUPPORT SERVICES FOR THIS CASE THE SUB PAYEE IS NOW JEANNETTE DEANN SIMPSON FSD# 2-213886 |
|
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Letter CORRECTION LTR SENT Notes: TO ROBERT SIMPSON, RESP RE: FEE WVR APP AND INC AND EXP DECL: JDG FOUND CONFLICTING INFO ON YOUR FEE WAIV APP AND YOUR INC AND EXP DECL. HE'S REQSTNG CLRFCTN ON THE CORRECT AMT OF INC AND EXPSS LISTED ON BOTH DOCS. FOR ASSTNC, GO TO THE FLF OFFICE AT X. I'VE PROVIDED A COMPLIMENTARY BLANK APP FOR WVR OF CRT FEES AND COSTS, AS WELL AS A COPY OF YOUR FILED APP FOR WAIVER OF CRT FEES AND COSTS FOR YOUR CONVENIENCE AND REFERENCE. LASTLY, PLS MAKE SURE THAT ANY AND ALL CORRECTIONS MADE TO A DOC ARE INITIALED BY YOU. *CALLED PARTY, DOCS ARE IN PUBLIC BIN |
|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: ROBERT SIMPSON ON 3-16-09 WITH JUDGMENT |
|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWYA |
|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: JEANETTE DEANN SIMPSON ON 3-16-09 WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT |
|
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL Notes: JDGMT ENTERED 3/5/09 |
|
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification PETITIONER NOT PRESENT ATTN NAKKEN APPEARS RESPONDENT NOT PRESENT DCSS ATTN PATRICK WARD PRESENT ATTORNEY NAKKEN STATES HE LEFT OFF THE PARTIES JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION WITH A MARTIAL STATUS AGREEMENT ATTACHED WITH APPROPRIATE LANGUAGE AS TO CHILD SUPPORT WITH HEALTH COVERAGE LANGUAGE INCLUDED- COUNTY IS GIVEN COPY OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BY ATTORNEY NAKKEN TO READ. COUNTY IS IN AGREEMENT TO THE MSA AND HAS NO OBJECTION TO THE COURT APPROVING THE PARTIES JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION WITH ATTACHED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. COUNTY DOES NOT HAVE TO SIGN OFF ON THE PARTIES MSA DISSOLUTION JUDGMENT. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Personal Appearance APPEAR/STIP/WAIVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.