Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of San Bern, Ardino, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Alvarenga, Reginald S, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 11/30/10 |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 12 BOX/SUSAN BERRY |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: ORDER AFTER HEARING FROM YOLO COUNTY DCSS | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS PATRICK WARD O/P SANDRA RAMIREZ FATHER IS ORDERED TO PAY $412.00 PER MONTH FOR CHILD IAN RAMIREZ BEGINNING NOV, 2010 AND ONGOING; AS PREVIOUSLY ORDERED, FATHER SHALL PROVIDE HEALTH INS AND IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE HEALTH INSURANCE CARD TO MOTHER; EACH PARENT PAYS ONE-HALF UNINSURED HEALTH CARE COSTS. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT/ OTHER: UNINSURED MEDICAL EXPENSES (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, PATRICK WARD) |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT Notes: CHILD SUPPORT | |
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF REG. SENT Notes: NOTICE OF REGISTRATION SENT TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT AND THEIR LOCAL DCSS AGENCY |
|
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) NTC OF PYMT OF SPPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.