Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pacheco, Mayra, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time286 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC/TRO PET PRESENT W/ATTY LARRABBEE RESPONDENT PRESENT PET REQUESTS CASE BE DISMISSED BASED ON THE FACT THAT RESP WAS ACQUITED IN CRIMINAL CASE Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC/TRO (DV) ATTY LARRABEE PRESENT FOR PETITIONER; RESPONDENT NOT PRESENT; COUNSEL ADV COURT CRIMINAL TRIAL IN SONOMA COUNTY TODAY INVOLVING THESE PARTIES; COURT CONTINUEDMATTER TO 10-12-06 8:30AM OSC/TRO DEPT 4; ALL CURRENT TEMP ORDERS REMIAN IN EFFECT. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment TRO TEMP RESTRAINING ORD Notes: PROTECTED PERSON MAYRA PACHECO; RESTRAINED PERSON MANUEL PACHECO; EXPIRES 9/21/06 HEARING DATE |
|
August 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause BOTH SIDES PRESENT IN COURT; PETITIONER WITH COUNSEL.COUNSEL ADVISED COURT THAT RESPONDENT STILL HAS PENDING CRIMINAL CASE IN SONOMA COUNTY. TEMPORARY ORDERS WILL REMAIN IN EFFECT; COUNSEL TO PREPARE A REISSUANCE. PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE: DISSOL CASE BEFORE NEXT HEARING AND IF NO RESOLUTION IS REACHED, IT WILL BE SEST FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO FILE CURRENT I&E'S BEFORE NEXT HEARING. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause TRIAL PENDING ON RESPONDENT. RESPONDENT REFERRED TO FCILITATOR FOR DISCLOSURES. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause PETITIONER PRESENT W/ATTY LARRABEE TEMPORARY ORDER REMAINS Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Notes: SERVED MANUEL PACHECO BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 3/4/06: REISSUE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE OSC Notes: REISSUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause PETITIONER PRESENT W/ATTY LARABEE RESPONDENT PRESENT TEMPORARY ORDER REMAINS Judge: Petre, Donna M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.