Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Junn, Sylvia Jean, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time12 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: CHARLES JAE HONG JUNN ON 12/30/05 DV-101, CHILD CUSTOYY, VISIT & SUPPORT REQ, REQ FOR ORDER MISC BLANK DCMTS ON 12/30/05 |
|
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause RESPONDENT PRESENT W/ATTY HAHN CASE DISMISSED Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER Notes: TO TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CUSTOMER DOC'S SENT TO PUBLIC BIN |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order APP/DECL OSC/TRO-DV |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.