Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morais, Edwin Jose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ryan, Shawna Leigh, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RESPONDENT SHAWNA LEIGH RYAN/J. RICHARD SOKOL |
|
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court VACATED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: VERONICA'S FILE AWAY. |
|
August 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference VACATED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
August 13, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER FROM ATTY SCOTT M. KENDALL CONFIRMING 8/13/07 SETTLMT CONF & 9/24/07 TRIAL HAVE BEEN DROPPED FROM CALENDAR. | |
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 6/14/07 (FILED BY RESP) |
|
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SUSAN BENDER'S ACCORDIAN FILE. COPIES MAILED TO ATTY SOKOL. |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER PRESENT; RESPONDENT PRESENT W/ ATT. SOKOL. COUNSEL STIPULATE TO TEMPORARY SUSPENSION OF SUPPORT SUBJECT TO RETORACTIVE MODIFICATION TO 5/3/07. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issue Spousal Support ISSUE: SPOUSAL SPPT Notes: SPOUSAL SUPPORT |
|
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MODIFICATION/SPOUSAL SUPPORT/ ATTY FEES AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.