Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 5/17/11 CASE NUMBER FS 08-732 IS ORDERED CONSOLIDATED INTO THIS LEAD CASE |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING FROM YOLO COUNTY DCSS | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 12 BOX/SUSAN BERRY |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Motion DCSS ANNE GLANZER COUNTY'S MOTION GRANTED CASE FS 08-732 IS CONSOLIDATED INTO FS 05-2231, LEAD CASE Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION RE OTHER: CONSOLIDATION (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, ANNE GLANZER) |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LTR FROM YOLO COUNTY DCSS REQUESTING THAT THE MATTER CURRENTLY ON CAL FOR 11/08/2010 @ 1:30PM IN DEPT 12 BE DROPPED, AS THE DEFT COULD NOT BE LOCATED FOR SERVICE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.