Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Moore, Shane M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2005 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions232 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time240 days |
*Order to Show Cause
Date: March 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Review WORK SEARCH STATUS Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING MATTER HEARD 02/27/17 FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#1130041243-01 |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Review STATUS WORK SEARCH Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON CAL 10/24/16 FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#1130041243-01 |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Review COUNTY'S CONTINUED REQUEST FOR WORK SEARCH ORDER Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM 6/13/16 |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
718 OSC* *Order to Show Cause Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM 3/14/16 |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: SHANE M MOORE WITH OEX AND OSC FILED 1/4/16 ON 1/14/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.