Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pacheco, Mayra, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pacheco, Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time458 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification PARTIES NOT PRESENT DCSS GLANZER PENDING STIPULATION SET 07/15/14 1:30 D12 OSC DCSS TO PREPARE FORMAL ORDER Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: SHORT ORDER FOR 06/17/14 |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION; MODIFICATION, CHILD SUPPORT, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER - RESP MANUEL PACHECO IS THE OBLIGOR; THE PARTIES AGREE TO GUIDELINE SUPPORT OF $269.00 PER MONTH. RESP ORDERED TO PAY $269.00 PER MO C/S ($66.00 FOR CHILD ESTRELLA PACHECO, $76.00 FOR CHILD MANUEL ANTONIO PACHECO, AND $127.00 FOR CHILD LUCERO PACHECO), BEGINNING 04/01/2010; RESP TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN HEALTH INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR THE CHILDREN; OTHER: ALL PREVIOUS ORDERS, NOT MODIFIED HEREIN, REMAIN IN EFFECT. |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Review DCSS PATRICK WARD TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AT COUNTY'S REQUEST STIPULATION REACHED AND FORTHCOMING Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY MANUEL PACHECO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.