We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Datec Corporation, A California Vs Eureka Technocrats, Inc.,

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Datec Corporation, A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Escient, Inc. An Indiana Corporation, Eureka Technocrats, Inc.,, Technisource Inc., An Indiana Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

June 21, 2011

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Other Contract

Practice Area

Commercial

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Case Cycle Time

359 days

Time To Management

198 days

Time To Trial

225 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

230 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Complaint - Other Contract Filed

Date: 2011-06-21T00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Date: 2011-10-07T00:00:00

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Case Management Conference

Judge: Delbert C. Gee

Docket Event Complaint - Other Contract Dismissed
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Tentative Case Management Order
Docket Event Declaration of Mahesh Bajoria Re Filing of Action in Michigan State & to Stay Proceedings Filed
Docket Event Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Docket Event Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order Filed
Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Judge: Delbert C. Gee

Docket Event Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted
See all events