Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Spencer, Joy, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Spencer, Samuel Harold, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Anne-Christine Massullo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnne-Christine Massullo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Prevention Without Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time91 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERS THE CONSOLIDATION OF CASE(S) FDV-06-804772 WITH CASE FDI-07-763395 FOR ALL PURPOSES; ALL FURTHER ENTRIES UNDER CASE FDI-07-763395 | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION | |
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) ON MAR-14-2007 DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR MAR-14-2007 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 403 | |
March 14, 2007 | Hearing |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE)
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: HUNG, DAISY J SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR SPENCER, JOY | |
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITIONER'S TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PETITIONER SPENCER, JOY SERVED MAR-02-2007, FAX OR FACSIMILE AS TO RESPONDENT SPENCER, SAMUEL HAROLD | |
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PETITIONER SPENCER, JOY | |
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-07-2007 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
February 07, 2007 | Hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.