Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Nien, Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nien, Kazuko, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Russell S. Roeca presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell S. Roeca Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING, HEARD ON JUL-11-2023 | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | OFF CALENDAR, COMPLIES WITH CCP 583.360 | |
July 11, 2023 | Hearing |
OTHER REVIEW HEARING
Judge: RUSSELL S. ROECA |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-11-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER REVIEW HEARING ON JUL-11-2023 OFF CALENDAR. | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 70320996) FILED BY RESPONDENT NIEN, KAZUKO | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RESPONDENTS STATUS DECLARATION FOR JULY 11, 2023 HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 70320996) FILED BY RESPONDENT NIEN, KAZUKO | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING, HEARD ON APR-18-2023 | |
April 18, 2023 | Hearing |
Request For Order Re: Child Custody And Visitation
Judge: RUSSELL S. ROECA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.