Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morgan, Heather Rhiannon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rego, Bruno De Souza, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Without Children |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time191 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (8 PAGE, 4 CERTIFIED FAMILY LAW JUDGMENTS) | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS SEP-07-2014 | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) *I&E AND PROP DECL ATTACHED* AS TO RESPONDENT REGO, BRUNO DE SOUZA | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: PRO PER | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: MAR-06-2014 FILED BY PETITIONER MORGAN, HEATHER RHIANNON | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER MORGAN, HEATHER RHIANNON | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING OUT OF COUNTRY SERVICE FROM CARLOS HUBERTO MASCARENHAS FILED BY PETITIONER MORGAN, HEATHER RHIANNON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.