Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
$30.00 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Russell S. Roeca presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell S. Roeca Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2013 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1225 days |
2013-10-22 (Petition For Dissolution Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C. Summons Issued And Filed)
2013-11-01 (Proof Of Service Of Summons, Service Date: Oct-26-2013 Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2014-03-04 (Application Pending For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Filed By Respondent Tan, Joseph C.)
2014-03-04 (Notice Of Nature Of Availability Of Alternative Dispute Resolution Methods In Family Law Matters Filed By Respondent Tan, Joseph C.)
2014-03-05 (Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52 As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C.)
2014-09-24 (Preliminary Declaration Regarding Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure And Income And Expense Statement Filed By Respondent Tan, Joseph C.)
2014-09-26 (Notice Of Hearing (domestic Violence) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C. Hearing Set For Oct-15-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 403)
2014-09-26 (Temporary Restraining Order (domestic Violence) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C.)
2014-09-30 (Request For Order Re Spousal Support Filed By Respondent Tan, Joseph C. As To Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. Hearing Set For Nov-04-2014 At 09:00 Am In Dept 403)
2014-10-09 (Proof Of Service-unable To Serve With Attached Diligence Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2014-11-20 (Request For Order Re: Spousal Support Filed By Respondent Tan, Joseph C. As To Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. Hearing Set For Dec-23-2014 At 09:00 Am In Dept 403)
2014-12-23 (Added To Calendar For Re: Enter Judgment And Resolve Financial Issues Hearing Set For Jan-23-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept 405)
2014-12-23 (Request For Order Re: Spousal Support On Dec-23-2014 Granted Per Written Order - Temporary Spousal Support)
2015-01-13 (Responsive Declaration To Request For Order On Calendar On Jan-23-2015 At 09:00 Am In Department 405 Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C.)
2015-01-23 (Re: Enter Judgment And Resolve Financial Issues On Jan-23-2015 Continued To Financial Matters - Self Represented Litigant Calendar On Feb-06-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 405 -)
2015-02-09 (Re: Enter Judgment And Resolve Financial Issues On Feb-06-2015 Continued To Financial Matters - Self Represented Litigant Calendar On Mar-06-2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 405 -)
2015-02-10 (Request For Order Modification Of Spousal Support Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C. Hearing Set For Mar-06-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept 405)
2015-03-25 (Re: Enter Judgment And Resolve Financial Issues On Mar-06-2015 Continued To Financial Matters - Self Represented Litigant Calendar On Jun-12-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 405 -)
2015-03-25 (Request For Order Modification Of Spousal Support On Mar-06-2015 Continued To Financial Matters - Self Represented Litigant Calendar On Jun-12-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 405 -)
2016-06-29 (Modification Of Spousal Support Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C. Hearing Set For Aug-02-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 403)
2016-08-02 (Modification Of Spousal Support On Aug-02-2016 Off Calendar - Per Letter To The Court From Petitioner, No Proof Of Service On File.)
2016-08-19 (Request For Order Re: Modification Of Spousal Support Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C. Hearing Set For Sep-20-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 403)
2016-09-20 (Added To Calendar For Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Oct-14-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 403)
2016-12-09 (Judicial Settlement Conference Held On Dec-09-2016. Not Settled. Continued To Feb-06-2017 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 403 For Further Settlement.)
2017-02-06 (Added To Calendar For Order To Show Cause For Failure To Appear At 2/6/17 Status Conference Hearing Hearing Set For Feb-27-2017 At 10:00 Am In Dept 403)
2017-02-06 (Status Conference Of Feb-06-2017 Continued To Feb-27-2017 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 403 Per Judge's Order)
2017-02-27 (Order To Show Cause For Failure To Appear At 2/6/17 Status Conference Hearing On Feb-27-2017 Off Calendar Per Court's Own Motion- Respondent Did Not Appear)
2022-04-12 (Request For Order [x] To Compel Petitioner To Pay Respondent ( See Item 8) Filed By Respondent Tan, Joseph C. As To Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. Hearing Set For May-12-2022 At 09:00 Am In Dept 403)
2022-04-29 (Responsive Declaration To Request For Order On Calendar On May-12-2022 At 09:00 Am In Department 403 Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L. As To Respondent Tan, Joseph C.)
2022-04-29 (Substitution Of Attorney: St.clair, Ronald Powelson Substituted For Pro Per As Attorney For Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-05-04 (Exhibits A Through C In Support Of Supplemental Declaration Of Mercedes L. Tan (transaction Id # 67586939) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-05-04 (Exhibits D Through F In Support Of Supplemental Declaration Of Mercedes L. Tan (transaction Id # 67586939) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-05-04 (Proof Of Service By Overnight Delivery (transaction Id # 67586650) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-05-04 (Supplemental Declaration Of Mercedes L. Tan (transaction Id # 67586650) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-05-12 (Request For Order [x] To Compel Petitioner To Pay Respondent ( See Item 8) On May-12-2022 Continued To Family Law: Law And Motion Calendar On Jul-28-2022 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 403 On All Remaining Issues. Atty To Prepare Foah.)
2022-07-18 (Declaration Of Ronald P. St. Clair (transaction Id # 67830511) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-07-18 (Due Diligence Declaration Regarding Attempts To Serve Subpoena For Production Of Business Records (transaction Id # 67830511) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-07-18 (Proof Of Service By Overnight Delivery (transaction Id # 67830511) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-07-18 (Supplemental Declaration Of Petitioner Mercedes L. Tan (transaction Id # 67830511) Filed By Petitioner Tan, Mercedes L.)
2022-07-28 (Request For Order [x] To Compel Petitioner To Pay Respondent ( See Item 8) On Jul-28-2022 Denied)
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B
Judge: RUSSELL S. ROECA |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS), EXPIRES SEP-06-2025, FILED BY PETITIONER TAN, MERCEDES L. AS TO RESPONDENT TAN, JOSEPH C. | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B ON SEP-06-2023 GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER - 2 YEAR R/O GRANTED | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-06-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
August 09, 2023 | Hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B
Judge: RUSSELL S. ROECA |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B ON AUG-09-2023 CONTINUED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE B CALENDAR ON SEP-06-2023 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 403 - AT RESPONDENT'S REQUEST. | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-09-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | (DV-116) ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER TAN, MERCEDES L. AS TO RESPONDENT TAN, JOSEPH C. | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER ON CALENDAR ON AUG-09-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 403 FILED BY RESPONDENT TAN, JOSEPH C. AS TO PETITIONER TAN, MERCEDES L. | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL DV-120 FILED BY RESPONDENT TAN, JOSEPH C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.