Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Belfer, Claude, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Belfer, Yuedan, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Linda Colfax presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Colfax Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time3938 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: CHOY, RANDALL PHILIP WITHDRAWN AS ATTORNEY FOR BELFER, YUEDAN | |
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: ADAMS, GEOFFREY CHARLES WITHDRAWN AS ATTORNEY FOR BELFER, CLAUDE | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER THEREON FILED BY RESPONDENT BELFER, YUEDAN | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | COURTROOM REJECT LETTER | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING, HEARD ON JUL-30-2015 | |
July 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Request For Order Re: Enforce Terms Of Judgment
Judge: LINDA COLFAX |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: ENFORCE TERMS OF JUDGMENT ON JUL-30-2015 OFF CALENDAR - SETTLED AT MEET AND CONFER AT HEARING | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-30-2015 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING, HEARD ON MAY-19-2015 | |
May 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Request For Order Re: Enforce Terms Of Judgment
Judge: LINDA COLFAX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.