Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Beltran, Martha, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Beltran, Leonidas De Jesus, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Without Children |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions123 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time353 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES PAID BY PETITIONER BELTRAN, MARTHA | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME AFTER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER BELTRAN, MARTHA | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS OCT-19-2007 | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event | LEGAL REJECT LETTER | |
September 13, 2007 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT (AMENDED) FILED BY PETITIONER BELTRAN, MARTHA | |
September 13, 2007 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT BELTRAN, LEONIDAS DE JESUS | |
September 13, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER BELTRAN, MARTHA | |
September 13, 2007 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST | |
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event | CLERK REJECT LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.