Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Porter Joynt, Linda Ann, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Geovera Holdings, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts Superior with Earl Bradley Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarl Bradley Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2023 |
CategoryEmployment: Other (15) |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Two and Trial Setting | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - One | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Record | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Statement | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Statement | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment Location Change | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Record | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - CASE MANAGEMENT CONF ONE | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Statement | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.