Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach, Llc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Pretti, Amy, in the jurisdiction of Solano County. This case was filed in Solano County Superior Courts with Harry S. Kinnicutt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarry S. Kinnicutt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2016 |
CategoryCb - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSolano County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT CACH, LLC., |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT CACH, LLC., |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT ISSUED CACH, LLC., |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
COURT DEFAULT JUDG (UNCONTEST) CACH, LLC., |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER CACH, LLC., |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | VACATED | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION CACH, LLC., |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL (PARTY ONLY) CACH, LLC., |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT CACH, LLC., |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.