Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Colclough Robert J, against Lee Lang, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with William D. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam D. Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2013 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time155 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-08-15 00:00:00
Date: 2013-08-15T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: May 04, 2016Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: February 26, 2019Writ issued
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2013-07-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST CALCULATION)
Date: February 26, 2019Writ - Return
Date: October 08, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-10-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-11-14 00:00:00
Date: 2013-11-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2014-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: April 24, 2017Memorandum of Cost
Date: October 03, 2016Request For Copies
Date: May 10, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.