Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Department Of Finance Of Sussex County, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Adams, Ryan T, against Jkc, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE SUSSEX Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2022 NOTICE |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2022 THIS JUDGMENT DEBT INTEREST AND COSTS FULLY PAID AND SATISFIED THIS 28TH DAY OF JUNE 2022 SO SAITH RYAN T. ADAMS ATTEST: MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67771498 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2022 POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM RYAN T. ADAMS, ESQ. AUTHORIZING PROTHONOTARY TO SATISFY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67764771 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 3, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 01-27-2021, SUMMONS WAS POSTED ON THE PROPERTY BY DEPUTY 01-26-2021. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66303015 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2021 MONITION WRIT ISSUED 01-22-2021 TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY TO POST UPON THE DEFENDANT'S PROPERTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66281340 WRIT ISSUED |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MONITIONS DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2021 INIT FILING MONITIONS |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2021 COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON MONITION FILED. TAX MAP PARCEL NO: 133-19.00-404.00 DESCRIPTION: INGRAM'S POINT LOT 129 24125 INGRAMS DRIVE MILLSBORO, DE 19966 TAX YEARS: 2017-2020 AMOUNT: $274.64 (RYAN T. ADAMS) PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF MONITION MONITION AND EXHIBITS A AND B ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66245415 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2021 COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON MONITION FILED. TAX MAP PARCEL NO: 133-19.00-404.00 DESCRIPTION: INGRAM'S POINT LOT 129 24125 INGRAMS DRIVE MILLSBORO, DE 19966 TAX YEARS: 2017-2020 AMOUNT: $274.64 (RYAN T. ADAMS) PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF MONITION MONITION AND EXHIBITS A AND B ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66245415 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.