Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deputy, Lyn, filed a(n) Petition Return Of Property case against State Of Delaware, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with Robert H. Robinson, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Robinson, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryPetition Return Of Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: MAY 25, 2022 NOTICE |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 25, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. 5-23-2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1) THE MAY 18, 2022, STIPULATED ORDER AND DISMISSAL IS AMENDED TO REFLECT THAT THE CORRECT VIN NUMBER FOR THE 2013 BMW IS WBAXH5C57DDW12364; AND 2) ALL OTHER TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF THE MAY 18, 2022, STIPULATED ORDER AND DISMISSAL REMAIN VALID AND IN EFFECT. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67654316 ORDER |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 24, 2022 LETTER FROM JOHN W. DONAHUE, ESQUIRE TO COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD. RE: REQUESTING THE STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL BE AMENDED TO REFLECT THE CORRECT VIN NUMBER. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67642432 LETTER |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 21, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. 5-18-2022. IT IS SO ORDERED THIS 18TH DAY OF MAY, 2022, THAT THE PETITION FOR RETURN OF PROPERTY IS DISMISSED; $354.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND ONE 2013 BMW WILL BE RETURNED TO THE PETITIONER BY THE DELAWARE STATE POLICE. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67640662 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: MAY 19, 2022 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM 5-18-2022 RETURN OF PROPERTY STATUS CONFERENCE ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67635324 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD 5/18/2022 - BC COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD PRESIDING PARTIES CAME TO AN AGREEMENT, STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FILED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 18, 2022 STATUS CONFERENCE HELD |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 12, 2022 LETTER FROM BRIAN CLAIRMONT TO COUNSEL AND LITIGANT. RE: STATUS CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MAY 18, 2022 AT 1:30 PM. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67609810 LETTER |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 12, 2022 ORDER LIFTING STAY SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD 5-11-2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1) THE STAY IN THIS MATTER IS LIFTED; AND 2) THIS ACTION SHALL PROCEED. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67609764 ORDER |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 8, 2021 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STATE OF DELAWARE'S SECOND DEMAND FOR STATE OF DELAWARE'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO LYN DEPUTY ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 66659610 RE-NOTICE |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD 5-4-2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1) THIS CIVIL PROCEEDING IS STAYING PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE CRIMINAL MATTER, STATE V. DEPUTY, DEF. ID# 2103008145, PENDING AGAINST PETITIONER IN THE SUPERIOR COURT; AND 2) UPON RESOLUTION OF THE CRIMINAL MATTER, THE STAY WILL BE LIFTED. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 66572391 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.