Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Town Of Millsboro, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Schrider-Fox, Mary R, against Garner, Gerald Anthony, Mcafee-Garner, Sheri Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with ROBINSON JR., ROBERT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBINSON JR., ROBERT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2021 |
CategorySell Real Estate For Prop Tax |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE - JUDGMENT SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2021 THIS JUDGMENT DEBT, INTEREST, AND COSTS FULLY PAID AND SATISFIED THIS 4TH DAY OF MAY, 2021; SO SAITH P.O.A. FROM MARY R. SCHRIDER-FOX, ESQUIRE OF STEEN, WAEHLER & SCHRIDER-FOX, LLC. ATTESTED BY MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66569394 NOTICE |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FOR SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2021 POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM MARY R. SCHRIDER-FOX, ESQUIRE OF STEEN, WAEHLER & SCHRIDER-FOX, LLC AUTHORIZING PROTHONOTARY'S OFFICE TO SATISFY JUDGMENT. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66563820 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2021 NOTICE |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING - MS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2021 SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - SELL REAL ESTATE PROPERTY TAX (MARY R. SCHRIDER-FOX) DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 6, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: SHERI LYNN MCAFEE-GARNER AND GERALD ANTHONY GARNER. JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: REAL PROPERTY TAX DUE: $719.50 PENALTY / INTEREST: $53.95 SPECIAL TAX DUE: $1,014.60 INTEREST / PENALTY ON SPECIAL TAX - 0.5%: $76.10 COLLECTION CHARGE ON SPECIAL TAX - 18%: $196.33 TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT = $2,060.48 PLUS ACCRUING INTEREST, PENALTIES, AND COLLECTION CHARGE ON SPECIAL TAX - NOTICE OF LIEN AFFIDAVIT - MAP PARCEL NO. 133-16.00-1681.00; PLANTATION LAKES, LOT 1044, SECTION A, MILLSBORO, DE 19966 ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66393794 MISC-SELL REAL ESTATE PROP TAX |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - SELL REAL ESTATE PROPERTY TAX DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 6, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: **ODP_CDIDOCA_ASSOC_PERSONS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: **DE_GENERAL_JUDG_ASSESSMENTS TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT = **DE_GENERAL_JUDGMENT_AMOUNT NOTICE OF LIEN AFFIDAVIT - MAP PARCEL NO. 133-16.00-1681.00 PLANTATION LAKES, LOT 1044, SECTION A, MILLSBORO ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66393794 MISC-SELL REAL ESTATE PROP TAX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.