Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Weil, Kathleen Dietrich, Dietrich, Kathleen Murray, filed a(n) Issuance Subpoena case against Weil, Alan Reed, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with ROBINSON JR., ROBERT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBINSON JR., ROBERT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryIssuance Subpoena |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 10, 2021 WRIT RETURNED MARCH 9, 2021 SUBPOENA SERVED UPON DEWEY POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING PTLM. J. SWANSON, DUTY OFFICER, ON MARCH 5, 2021. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66404235 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2021 NOTICE |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2021 OUT OF STATE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF TO SERVE DEWEY BEACH POLICE DEPARTMENT ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66385300 SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISC. - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA - MMT (REQUESTING LAW FIRM - THE HAVRILAK LAW FIRM) DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2021 OUT OF STATE SUBPOENA (FILED 3-1-21) ATTACHMENTS COVER LETTER ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66383706 MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.