Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Burton Construction Company, Llc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Rushdan Ii, Wali W, against Broadpoint Construction, Llc, Carl M. Freeman Foundation, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with 000907 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge000907 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryMechanics Lien |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 7, 2021 NOTICE |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 20, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 3/19/2021. SERVED THE CARL M. FREEMAN FOUNDATION, INC BY SERVING VICTOR MESSICK, THE REG AGENT ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66438430 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 18, 2021 WRIT RETURNED ON 3-17-21. SERVED BROADPOINT CONSTRUCTION, LLC BY SERVING MIKE DRULLES, FATHER-IN-LAW, TO AGENT ON 3-15-21. ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66428850 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 18, 2021 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66430333 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED TO KENT COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON THE CARL M. FREEMAN FOUNDATION, INC ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66412867 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON BROADPOINT CONSTRCUTION, LLC ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66412867 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 10, 2021 AMENDED PRAECIPE SUMMONS- KENT SUMMONS - SUSSEX ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66403028 PRAECIPE FILED |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2021 COMPLAINT AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM FOR MECHANIC'S LIEN EXHIBITS A THROUGH D CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER PROPOSED ORDER TO MOTION PRAECIPE SUMMONS - CARL M. FREEMAN FOUNDATION - SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER SUMMONS - BROADPOINT CONSTRUCTION - SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66390702 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MECHANIC LIEN - MMT (WALI W. RUSHDAN, II) FILED 3-4-21 FOR THE FURNISHING OF MATERIALS AND LABOR ON THE CREDIT OF SAID STRUCTURE. THE STRUCTURE IS LOCATED MORE PARTICULARILY DESCRIBED TO WIT: 31255 AMERICANA PARKWAY, SELBYVILLE, DE 19975 TAX PARCEL NO: 533-19.00-777.00 LIEN DATE: NOVEMBER 10, 2020 DEMAND: $76,391.90 DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2021 INIT FILING MECHANIC LIEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.