Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Thompson, Melanie J, against Waite, Clay E, Owens, Michelle L, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with Robert H. Robinson, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Robinson, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2022 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 2, 2022 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM CIVIL MOTION HEARD APRIL 1, 2022. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67446347 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION HEARD APRIL 1, 2022 - MS JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. PRESIDING. MELANIE J. THOMPSON, ESQUIRE PRESENT FOR THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT(S) NOT PRESENT. - THE PARTIES HAD A DISCUSSION PRIOR TO THE HEARING AND SETTLED THE MATTER. - DEFENDANT MICHELLE L. OWENS' (WAITE'S) MOTION TO SET ASIDE SHERIFF'S SALE, GRANTED, AT THE PARTIES' REQUEST. - PROPOSED ORDER TO BE PROVIDED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 1, 2022 MOTION GRANTED |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 2, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. APRIL 1, 2022. IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE SHERIFF'S SALE IS HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE JUDGMENT OF SEPTEMBER 10, 2021 IS HEREBY VACATED, AND THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DUE TO REINSTATEMENT OF THE LOAN. (COPY OF ORDER FOWARDED TO DEFENDANT(S) VIA MAIL) ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67447232 ORDER |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 2, 2022 PROPOSED AMENDED ORDER (AS TO HEARING HELD APRIL 1, 2O22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67446954 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2022 - MS REMOVED FROM CALENDAR. RE-NOTICED BY THE PARTIES. DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 17, 2022 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 18, 2022 PLAINTIFF'S RE-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT MICHELLE L. OWENS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE SHERIFF SALE, RESCHEDULED TO BE HEARD FRIDAY, APRIL 1, 2022, AT 11:00 A.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67401727 RE-NOTICE |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2022 RE-NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT MICHELLE L. OWENS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE SHERIFF SALE, RESCHEDULED TO BE HEARD ON FRIDAY, MARCH 18, 2022, AT 11:00 A.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67323321 RE-NOTICE |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 18, 2022 - MS REMOVED FROM CALENDAR. CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WITH DEFENDANT'S CONSENT TO MARCH 18, 2022. (DEFENDANT NOTIFIED VIA TELEPHONE THAT THE HEARING WILL BE IN-PERSON) DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 17, 2022 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 9, 2022 LETTER FROM MARCO SUAREZ, JUDICIAL CASE MANAGER, TO THE PARTIES. RE: A HEARING ON DEFENDANT MICHELLE L. OWENS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE SHERIFF'S SALE, IS SCHEDULED TO BE HELD ON FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2022, AT 11:00 A.M., VIA TELECONFERENCE. (TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION PROVIDED) ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67300043 NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 21, 2022 - MS REMOVED FROM CALENDAR. RE-NOTICED BY PLAINTIFF / RESCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 18, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M. SPOKE TO MS. OWENS (WAITE) ABOUT NEW MOTION DATE AND T/C INFORMATION. DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2022 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.