Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Paper Profits Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Blythe, Darlene W, Di Lorenzo, Catherine M, against Jester, Wayne R., in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts Superior with ROBINSON JR., ROBERT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBINSON JR., ROBERT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION WRIT RETURNED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 18, 2022 WRIT RETURNED NOVEMBER 17, 2022 LANDS AND TENEMENTS TO BE SOLD ON NOVEMBER 15, 2022, AND SALE STAYED ON NOVEMBER 14, 2022. RETURNED TO COURT PER ATTORNEY. LETTER ATTACHED: CANCELLATION E-MAIL. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 68398050 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 18, 2022 EXECUTION WRIT RETURNED NOVEMBER 17, 2022. LANDS AND TENEMENTS TO BE SOLD ON NOVEMBER 15, 2022, AND SALE STAYED ON NOVEMBER 14, 2022. RETURNED TO COURT PER ATTORNEY. LETTER ATTACHED: CANCELLATION E-MAIL. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 68398050 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF CATHERINE DI LORENZO, ESQUIRE, WITH: - NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE; SHERIFF'S AD (SALE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 15, 2022); - PROOF OF MAILING; AND - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 68378680 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF CATHERINE DI LORENZO, ESQUIRE; NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE; SHERIFF'S AD (SALE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 15, 2022); PROOF OF MAILING; AND AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 68378680 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 28, 2022 WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 68173102 EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2022 WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67930834 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 2, 2022 NOTICE |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE - BANKRUPTCY ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 27, 2022 ORDER TERMINATING AUTOMATIC STAY UNDER SECTION 362 OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE. ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE BRENDAN LINEHAN SHANNON ON JUNE 15, 2022; U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT C.A. NO. 21-10946-BLS NOTICE |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 27, 2022 JUDGMENT (IN REM) IS ENTERED AGAINST: WAYNE R. JESTER. JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL BALANCE: $28,429.68 ACCRUED INTEREST: $163.46 UNPAID INTEREST: $16,286.35 UNPAID LATE CHARGES: $2,112.56 UNPAID CHARGES: $83.25 OTHER FEES: $95.00 LESS RESERVE BALANCE: -($11.47) TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT = $47,158.83 (PLUS INTEREST ACCRUING FROM 7/22/2022 AT $5.27 PER DIEM, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, FEES AND COSTS, LATE CHARGES AND ADVANCES) - DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS AND SCRA SEARCH ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67859942 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT LOSS MITIGATION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 27, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF LOSS MITIGATION ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67857002 AFFIDAVIT LOSS MITIGATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.