Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pak, Michael K, Charlton, Janet Z, against Campos, Alicia T., in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with Craig A. Karsnitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig A. Karsnitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: JULY 30, 2021 NOTICE |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 29, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG A. KARSNITZ ON 7-28-21. IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66804049 ORDER |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2021 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66800631 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2021 2ND CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD. THE PARTIES HAVE REACHED A MUTUALLY AGREEABLE RESOLUTION. THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO A TRIAL MORTGAGE MODIFICATION, WHICH MUST BE VERIFIED BEFORE ANY JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF WILL SEEK TO DISMISS THE FORECLOSURE ACTION UPON THE CONVERSION OF THE TRIAL MODIFICATION TO A PERMANENT MODIFICATION NO LATER THAN 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SUCH CONVERSION. MEDIATION FEE: NOT REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66787231 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 23, 2021 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD. AN ADDITIONAL VIRTUAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR JULY 19 2021 AT 12:00 P.M. MEDIATION FEE: NOT REQUIRED. ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66535813 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 10, 2021 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. VIRTUAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 19, 2021 AT 12:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66402493 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2021 WRIT RETURNED ON 2-17-21. SERVED ALICIA T. CAMPOS PERSONALLY ON 2-15-21. ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66345581 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON ALICIA T. CAMPOS ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66327668 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2021 COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-1 CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS - SUSSEX EXHIBIT A - MORTGAGE EXHIBIT B - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT C - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT D - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT E - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT F - FAIR DEBT ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66306051 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - GGM (IN REM) (JANET Z. CHARLTON / MICHAEL K. PAK / ANDREW A. RALLI) DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2021 INIT FILING MORTGAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.