Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sunrise Windows, Ltd., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kerrick, Daniel C, against Backyard Works Inc., in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with KARSNITZ, CRAIG A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKARSNITZ, CRAIG A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 28, 2021 THIS JUDGMENT DEBT INTEREST AND COSTS FULLY PAID AND SATISFIED THIS 27TH DAY OF SEPTEMBER, 2021. SO SAITH: POA FROM DANIEL C. KERRICK ATTEST: MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 66964939 NOTICE |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 25, 2021 POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DANIEL C. KERRICK AUTHORIZING MYRTLE A. THOMAS, PROTHONOTARY OF SUSSEX COUNTY TO SATISFY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 66959518 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 3, 2021 NOTICE |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT - GGM DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: BACKYARD WORKS INC. JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL AMOUNT $8,447.09 PLUS, POST JUDGMENT INTEREST AT THE LEGAL RATE OF 5%, REASONABLE ATTORNEY FESS AND COURT COSTS. TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $8,447.09 PLAINTIFF'S DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66573307 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 4-15-2021. NON-EST AS TO BACKYARD WORKS INC. (AT 26533 LEWES-GEORGETOWN HWY ADDRESS) ON 4-12-2021. FORMER ADDRESS. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66530643 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 4-20-2021. SERVED BACKYARD WORKS INC. BY SERVING BOBBY BROOKS, MANAGER (AT 26822 LEWES-GEORGETOWN HWY ADDRESS), ON 4-12-2021. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66530643 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 10, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON BACKYARD WORKS INC. ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66500098 WRIT ISSUED |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 6, 2021 COMPLAINT CIVIL CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS - SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF EXHIBIT A ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66482818 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT- GGM (DANIEL C. KERRICK) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 6, 2021 INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.