Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hitch, Wendy, Hitch, William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gill, Edward C, against Coffin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with KARSNITZ, CRAIG A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKARSNITZ, CRAIG A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 21, 2022 NOTICE |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 18, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG A. KARSNITZ ON 11-16-2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THIS CASE IS DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 68398091 ORDER |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 68391756 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 2/16/2023 - GGM WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR/ SETTLED PRIOR TO CONFERENCE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 3, 2022 LETTER FROM GRACIELA GARCIA TO COUNSEL. RE: THE COURT HAS BEEN NOTIFIED BY COUNSEL THAT ALL PARTIES HAVE SETTLED THIS MATTER. A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL MUST BE FILED BY THE PARTIES WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 68021538 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 3/20/2023 - GGM WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2022 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2022 LETTER FROM EDWARD C. GILL, ESQUIRE TO THE COURT RE: THAT THE CASE HAS SETTLED ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 68016735 LETTER |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 12, 2022 RE-NOTICE OF REMOTE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF WILLIAM HITCH TO TAKE PLACE ON THURSDAY, AUGUST 25, 2022 AT 2:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67920907 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 13, 2022 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL COFFIN SCHEDULED FOR 8/25/2022 AT 3:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 67924241 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 2, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG A. KARSNITZ 7-1-2022. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED BY AND BETWEEN THE PARTIES, THROUGH THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL, AND SUBJECT TO THE APPROVAL OF THIS COURT, THAT THE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER IN THIS MATTER IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS; PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORTS 9-30-2022; DEFENDANT'S EXPERT REPORTS 1-31-2023; DEFENDANT'S DAUBERT MOTIONS 10-28-2022; ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 67784107 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.