Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diamico, Jeanne, Diamico, Louis J., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gelof, Kelly D, against Gussford 3Rd, John T., Feldman, Taylor Marie, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with Robert H. Robinson, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Robinson, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL THREE-DAY JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 17, 2022 - MS REMOVED FROM CALENDAR. SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL. DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 25, 2022 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 1, 2022 - MS REMOVED FROM CALENDAR. SETTLED AT MEDIATION. DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 25, 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 14, 2022 LETTER FROM YVONNE T. SAVILLE, MEDIATOR, TO COUNSEL. RE: INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING MEDIATION HEARING DATE FOR WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 24, 2022, AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67718635 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2022 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT BY DR. WILLIAM NEWELL, ECONOMIC EXPERT REPORT BY DR. DAVID BLACK, AND THE VOCATIONAL EXPERT REPORT BY MR. JOSE CASTRO, INCLUDING EACH OF THEIR CV'S, DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67395371 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' SOCIAL SECURITY DISBILITY FILE DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67328363 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE MARK H. CONNER FEBRUARY 1, 2022. IT IS ORDERED THAT: - PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO 3-15-2022 - DEFENDANTS' EXPERT DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO 7-15-2022 - DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO 8-15-2022 ALL OTHER DATES REMAIN UNCHANGED. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67280190 ORDER |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 1, 2022 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE DATES ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 67276323 STIPULATION |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD SEPTEMBER 13, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED THAT: - THIS CASE HAS BEEN REASSIGNED TO JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. - THE CAPTION IS HEREBY AMENDED TO READ AS SET FORTH ABOVE - MEDIATION SHALL TAKE PLACE ON OR BEFORE 7-29-2022 - MOTIONS TO AMEND PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED BY 11-30-2021 - PLAINTIFFS SHALL IDENTIFY EXPERT WITNESSES BY 1-31-2022 - DEFENDANT SHALL IDENTIFY EXPERT WITNESSES BY 5-31-2022 - DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 7-29-2022 - DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 7-22-2022 - RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED BY 8-11-2022 - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 9-01-2022 AT 9:00 A.M. - PRETRIAL STIPULATION IS DUE BY NOON ON 8-25-2022 - PLAINTIFFS' ($150.00) TRIAL FEE IS DUE BY 9-01-2022 - ALL MARKED EXHIBITS SHALL BE FILED 10 DAYS BEFORE TRIAL - MEDIA EQUIPMENT MUST BE TESTED NO LATER THAN 7 DAYS BEFORE TRIAL - MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED 14 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL - RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL - JURY INSTRUCTIONS SHALL BE SUBMITTED AT LEAST 10 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL - THREE-DAY JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED TO COMMENCE ON 10-17-2022 AT 9:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66926664 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HELD 9/13/2021 - BC COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD PRESIDING DATES ESTABLISHED FOR SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 13, 2021 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HELD |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 31, 2021 LETTER FROM BRIAN CLAIRMONT TO COUNSEL. RE: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 13, 2021 AT 9:45 AM. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 66809735 LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.