Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Marlow, Logan R., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stanley, Joseph D, against Passwaters, David A., in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with KARSNITZ, CRAIG A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKARSNITZ, CRAIG A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 15, 2021 NOTICE |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 4, 2021 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66653820 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
120 DAY LETTER - DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 3, 2021 LETTER FROM GRACIELA GARCIA TO COUNSEL RE: IT HAS BEEN OVER 90 DAYS SINCE THE FILING OF THIS CASE WITHOUT PROOF OF SERVICE UPON DAVID A. PASSWATERS. YOU HAD UNTIL THE 120TH DAY AFTER FILING TO ACCOMPLISH SERVICE. IF THERE IS NO PROOF OF SERVICE AND NO EXTENSION REQUESTED THIS CASE WILL BE DISMISSED ACCEPTED BY: GGM TRANSACTION ID: 66649511 120 DAY LETTER- DISMISSAL |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO - MMT (JOSEPH D. STANLEY) DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2021 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2021 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PRAECIPE RULE 3H STATEMENT SUMMONS - SUSSEX ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66385166 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.