Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kellam, William T, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Campbell, Dean A, against Truitt, Carrie, Camper, Deon, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with Robert H. Robinson, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Robinson, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryEjectment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2021 NOTICE |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: JULY 3, 2021 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM JULY 2, 2021 PETITION HEARING. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66738169 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CLOSED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 3, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. JULY 2, 2021. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE COURT HEREBY ISSUES A WRIT OF EJECTMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS, AND DECLARES AND DECREES, THAT PLAINTIFF IS THE TILE RECORD OWNER OF THE LANDS IDENTIFIED AS THE SUBJECT PROPERTY. THE DEFENDANTS SHALL IMMEDIATELY VACATE THE PROPERTY AND PLAINTIFF IS PLACED IN FULL POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY. (COPY OF ORDER FORWARDED TO DEFENDANTS VIA MAIL) ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66738169 NO TRIAL/JUDG: PLTF/OTHER |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
EJECTMENT RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING HELD JULY 2, 2021 - MS JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. PRESIDIING. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL PRESENT. DEFENDANTS FAILED TO APPEAR IN-PERSON AND BY TELEPHONE. PETITION GRANTED. ORDER ENTERED. DATE DOCKETED: JULY 2, 2021 MOTION GRANTED |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2021 LETTER FROM DEAN A. CAMPBELL, ESQUIRE, TO JUDGE ROBINSON. RE: IN REGARDS TO THE RULE TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A WRIT OF EJECMENT HEARING FOR JULY 2, 2021, PLAINTIFF PROVIDES A REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO REQUIRE DEFENDANTS TO VACATE IMMEDIATELY. REVISED PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66717589 LETTER |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 23, 2021 LETTER FROM JUDICIAL CASE MANAGER, TO THE PARTIES. RE: CONFIRMATION OF RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHEDULED TO BE HELD ON FRIDAY, JULY 2, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. AT THE SUSSEX COUNTY COURTHOUSE (IN-PERSON). ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66707022 NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRITS RETURNED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 2, 2021 WRITS RETURNED JUNE 1, 2021 - SERVED DEON CAMPER PERSONALLY ON MAY 28, 2021. - SERVED CARRIE TRUITT BY SERVING DEON CAMPER, CO-HABITOR, ON MAY 28, 2021. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66646810 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 19, 2021 RULE TO SHOW CAUSE SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE UPON CARRIE TRUITT. (TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION INCLUDED) ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66609179 WRIT ISSUED |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 19, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. MAY 17, 2021. RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 2, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. ENCLOSURE - TELECONFERENCE HEARING INSTRUCTIONS ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66609125 ORDER |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 19, 2021 RULE TO SHOW CAUSE SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE UPON DEON CAMPER. (TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION INCLUDED) ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66609179 WRIT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.