Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wollard, Scott, filed a(n) Transfer From Chancery Court case against Yoder And Sons Construction Llc, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with ROBERT H. ROBINSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERT H. ROBINSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2021 |
CategoryTransfer From Chancery Court |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2022 NOTICE |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. ON JUNE 22, 2022. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION IS HEREBY DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY BEARING ITS OWN COSTS. SO ORDERED. (COPY OF ORDER FORWARDED TO PLAINTIFF VIA E-MAIL) ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67755126 ORDER |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MEDIATOR'S REPORT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2022 LETTER FROM ROBERT V. WITSIL, JR., ESQUIRE, MEDIATOR, TO JUDGE ROBINSON. RE: REPORTING THAT THE PARTIES HELD MEDIATION ON FRIDAY, MAY 20, 2022, AND HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT TO RESOLVE THE LITIGATION. STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL SHALL BE FILED BY THE PARTIES. I AM PLEASED TO BE OF ASSISTANCE AT THE CALL OF THE COURT OR BY REQUEST OF THE PARTIES. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67756198 MEDIATOR'S REPORT FILED |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED - STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 23, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67747942 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
VOICE MESSAGE LEFT WITH ROBERT WITSIL, JR., ESQUIRE, MEDIATOR - MS INQUIRING STATUS OF MEDIATION HELD ON OR ABOUT MAY 20, 2022 (MR. WITSIL WAS CONTACTED TWO WEEKS AGO REGARDING THIS) DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 7, 2022 NOTICE |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 10, 2022 LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF, TO JUDGE ROBINSON, FILED MAY 9, 2022 (PRO SE). RE: PLAINTIFF DISAGREES WITH DEFENDANT'S LETTER RESPONSE FILED MAY 5, 2022 AND REITERATES REQUEST(S) TO THE COURT FOR A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67598934 LETTER |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2022 LETTER FROM DAVID C. HUTT, ESQUIRE, TO JUDGE ROBINSON. RE: IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S LETTER FILED MAY 2, 2022. DEFENDANT DISAGREES WITH MR. WOLLARD'S REQUEST FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE. DEFENDANT HOPES THAT THE FIRST SESSION WITH A NEW MEDIATOR WOULD BE CONDUCTED BEFORE MAY 31, 2022. A STATUS CONFERENCE SEEM UNNECESSARY FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THIS LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67592665 LETTER |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 3, 2022 LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF TO JUDGE ROBINSON, FILED MAY 2, 2022 (PRO SE) RE: REQUESTING FOR A STATUS TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE WITH THE PARTIES, AS SOON AS POSSIBLE, TO DISCUSS WHAT HAS TRANSPIRED SINCE LAST DISCUSSION WITH THE COURT AND NEXT STEPS IN THE CASE. ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67573153 LETTER |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION TELECONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 9, 2021 - MS REMOVED FROM CALENDAR. ORDER TO STAY ACTION ENTERED PRIOR TO HEARING. DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 8, 2021 MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 9, 2021 MOTION TO APPOINT BERNARD G. CONAWAY, ESQUIRE AS MEDIATOR (DAVID C. HUTT) JOINT STIPULATION TO APPOINT MEDIATOR AND PROPOSED ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION TO BE HEARD AT THE COURT'S CONVENIENCE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 67076281 MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.