Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bosley, Jessica M., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carey, Blake W, against Hardesty, Laura C., in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with CONNER, MARK H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONNER, MARK H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 5, 2023 NOTICE |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 23, 2023 NOTICE OF MAILING OF ORDER FROM 3-3-23 BEING RETURNED TO SENDER, REFUSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD, RECEIVED 3-20-23 ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 69605855 NOTICE |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 3-29-23 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / DISMISSED - MMT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 6, 2023 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 5-1-23 WAS REMOVED FROM THE CALENDAR / DISMISSED PRIOR TO TRIAL - MMT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 6, 2023 TRL SCHD: DISMISS PRIOR TRIAL |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION HEARD ON 3-3-23 - MMT JUDGE MARK H. CONNER PRESIDING - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WAS GRANTED - PLAINTIFF DID NOT PRESENT, NO CONTACT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2023 MOTION GRANTED |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2023 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM CIVIL MOTION HEARD ON 3-3-23 ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 69267866 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE MARK H. CONNER ON 3-3-23. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (MAILED TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS AND EMAILED) ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 69268213 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 1, 2023 NOTICE OF MOTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO PROSECUTE SCHEDULED TO BE HEARD ON MARCH 3, 2023, AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 69031049 NOTICE |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 31, 2023 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (MICHELE M. SUBERS) EXHIBIT A PROPOSED ORDER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 69030426 MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 7, 2023 NOTICE OF RETURN ENVELOPE TO PLAINTIFF OF BOTH ORDERS FROM 12-16-22, FILED 1-5-23. NOTED "RETURN TO SENDER, ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN, UNABLE TO FORWARD" ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 68813676 NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.